EP0323262 - Ink tank and ink jet recording apparatus having the ink tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukazawa, Heido No. 101 Sakaehaitsu 295-3, Kamigo-cho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312418.2 | 29.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | JP19870335362 | 29.12.1987 Original published format: JP 33536287 | JP19880326068 | 26.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32606888 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323262 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323262 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323262 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/18 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/1721 (EP,US);
B41J2/1728 (EP,US);
B41J2/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/27] | B41J3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Tintenbehälter und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät ausgestattet mit diesem Tintenbehälter | [1989/27] | English: | Ink tank and ink jet recording apparatus having the ink tank | [1989/27] | French: | Réservoir d'encre et appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre ayant ce réservoir | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 14.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.1994 | BE | 19.10.1994 | CH | 19.10.1994 | ES | 19.10.1994 | GR | 19.10.1994 | IT | 19.10.1994 | LI | 19.10.1994 | NL | 19.10.1994 | LU | 31.12.1994 | SE | 19.01.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
BE | 19.10.1994 | ||
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
ES | 19.10.1994 | ||
GR | 19.10.1994 | ||
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
LU | 31.12.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
BE | 19.10.1994 | ||
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
GR | 19.10.1994 | ||
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
LU | 31.12.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
BE | 19.10.1994 | ||
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
BE | 19.10.1994 | ||
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
BE | 19.10.1994 | ||
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 19.10.1994 | |
CH | 19.10.1994 | ||
LI | 19.10.1994 | ||
SE | 19.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/17] | CH | 19.10.1994 | |
LI | 19.10.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60090767 ; | [Y]JP60189455 ; | [A]JP60151055 ; | [A]JP60044352 ; | [X]US4604633 (KIMURA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [X]DE3708865 (CANON KK [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 235 (M-415)(1958), 21 September 1985; & JP-A-60 090 767 (RICOH K.K.) 21-05-1985, & JP60090767 A 19850921 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 33 (M-452)(2090), 8 February 1986; & JP-A-60 189 455 (CANON K.K.) 26-09-1985, & JP60189455 A 19860208 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 316 (M-438)(2039), 12 December 1985; & JP-A-60 151 055 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K.) 08-08-1985, & JP60151055 A 19851212 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 172 (M-397)(1895), 17 July 1985; & JP-A-60 044 352 (CANON K.K.) 09-03-1985, & JP60044352 A 19850717 | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 235 (M-415)(1958), 21 September 1985; JP-A-60 90 767 (RICOH K.K.) 21.05.1985 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol 9, no. 316 (M-438)(2039), 12 December 1985; JP-A-60 151 055 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K.) 08.08.11986 |