EP0355232 - Road drawing system for a navigation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHINSANGYOKAIHATSU 1-33-3, Hatagaya Shibuya-Ku Tokyo 151 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | ||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHINSANGYOKAIHATSU 1-33-3, Hatagaya Shibuya-Ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nimura, Mitsuhiro c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | 02 /
Nanba, Akimasa c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | 03 /
Yokoyama, Shoji c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-11 / JP | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 88312449.7 | 30.12.1988 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | JP19880209053 | 23.08.1988 Original published format: JP 20905388 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0355232 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0355232 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
G01C21/3667 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/09] | G01C21/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/09] | Title | German: | Strassenwiedergabesystem für Navigationsapparat | [1990/09] | English: | Road drawing system for a navigation apparatus | [1990/09] | French: | Système d'affichage des rues pour un appareil de navigation | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 23.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/44] | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XE]EP0346491 ; | [X]GB2100001 ; | [A]EP0119674 |