EP0325063 - Use of 1,4-disubstituted-piperidinyl compounds in the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of insomnia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. P.O. Box 156300 2110 East Galbraith Road Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. P.O. Box 156300 2110 East Galbraith Road Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schechter, Paul J. 20, rue du Général Ducrot F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 02 /
Orwin, John M. 4, Place des Moulins F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
Hinze, Christian Karl 35, rue Cuvier F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400131.4 | 21.01.1988 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0325063 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325063 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/445 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/20 (EP);
F02D45/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/36] |
Former [1989/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung von 1,4-disubstituierten-Piperidinyl-Verbindungen zur Herstellung eines Arzneimittels zur Behandlung von Schlaflosigkeit | [1989/30] | English: | Use of 1,4-disubstituted-piperidinyl compounds in the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of insomnia | [1989/30] | French: | Utilisation des composés piperidinyliques 1,4-disubstitués pour la manufacture d'un médicament pour le traitement de l'insomnie | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/10] | 19.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0208235 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) | [Y] - BRAIN RESEARCH, vol. 378, no. 1, 16th July 1986, pages 164-168, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V.; C. IDZIKOWSKI et al.: "5-Hydroxytryptamine-2 antagonist increases human slow wave sleep" | [Y] - JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL SOCIETY MEDICINE, vol. 80, no. 7, July 1987, pages 409-413, The Royal Society of Medicine; P.A.J. JANSSEN: "Does ritanserin, a potent serotonin-S2 antagonist, restore energetic functions during the night?" | Examination | - Sandrini et al.: "European J. of Pharmacology" 130 (1986), p. 311-314 | - Drug Intelligence and Clinical Pharmacy, vol. 20 (1986), p. 770-775 |