EP0277068 - Pleasure boat for observing the bottom of the sea [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1991 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramond, Marcel 159 bis quai de Valmy F-75010 Paris / FR | [1988/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 23, rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400138.9 | 22.01.1988 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | FR19870000942 | 27.01.1987 Original published format: FR 8700942 | [1988/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277068 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B63G8/00, B63C11/48 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
B63C11/49 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, ES, GB, GR, IT [1988/31] | Title | German: | Freizeitsboot zur Beobachtung des Seebodens | [1988/31] | English: | Pleasure boat for observing the bottom of the sea | [1988/31] | French: | Embarcation de plaisance pour l'observation des fonds marins | [1988/31] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 25.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 02.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/13] | 25.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8601572U ; | [A]US3379157 ; | [A]US4276851 ; | [A]CH304935 |