EP0301923 - Electric power supply, especially for a wave generator of a pulse radar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRONIQUE SERGE DASSAULT 55, quai Marcel Dassault F-92214 Saint-Cloud / FR | [1989/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Domenget, Jean-Pierre 62, rue du Colonel Rochebrune F-92380 Garches / FR | 02 /
Lorec, Gérard 15, avenue du Lycée Lakanal F-92340 Bourg La Reine / FR | [1989/05] | Representative(s) | Plaçais, Jean Yves, et al Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Plaçais, Jean-Yves, et al Cabinet Netter, 40, rue Vignon F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400168.6 | 26.01.1988 | [1989/05] | Priority number, date | FR19870010922 | 31.07.1987 Original published format: FR 8710922 | [1989/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0301923 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0301923 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/28, H02M3/28 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
G01S7/282 (EP,US);
H02M3/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1989/05] | Title | German: | Elektrische Versorgungseinrichtung, besonders für einen Wellengenerator eines Impuls-Radars | [1989/05] | English: | Electric power supply, especially for a wave generator of a pulse radar | [1989/05] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation électrique, en particulier pour un générateur d'ondes pour un radar à impulsions | [1989/05] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/17] | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 12.08.1992 | GB | 26.01.1993 | ES | 27.01.1993 | BE | 31.01.1993 | [2004/37] |
Former [1994/02] | DE | 12.08.1992 | |
GB | 26.01.1993 | ||
BE | 31.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/51] | DE | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 31.01.1993 | ||
Former [1993/15] | DE | 12.08.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2590745 (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]); | [A]WO8705165 (FANUC LTD [JP]) |