EP0281457 - Process for the installation of a heating and/or air conditioning device in a motor vehicle, and installation unit for carrying out this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.08.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1990 | Refusal of application | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO 64 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states VALEO 64 Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Danieau, Jacques 28, Allée du Hameau Fleuri F-78590 Noisy-Le-Roi / FR | [1988/36] | Application number, filing date | 88400338.5 | 16.02.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | FR19870002271 | 20.02.1987 Original published format: FR 8702271 | [1988/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0281457 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
B60H1/0055 (EP);
B60H1/00535 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1988/36] | Title | German: | Montageverfahren für eine Heizungs- und/oder Klimaanlage in einem Kraftfahrzeug und Montageeinheit für die Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1988/36] | English: | Process for the installation of a heating and/or air conditioning device in a motor vehicle, and installation unit for carrying out this process | [1988/36] | French: | Procédé de montage d'un appareil de chauffage et/ou climatisation dans un véhicule automobile, et unité de montage pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1988/36] | File destroyed: | 02.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 22.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1990/42] | 01.06.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61018538 ; | [X]DE3143503 ; | [X]DE3001274 ; | [A]DE3401039 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 167 (M-488)[2223], 13 juin 1986; & JP-A-61 018 538 (KASAI-KOGYO K.K.) 27-01-1986, & JP61018538 A 00000000 |