Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0283398 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1992 | B1 | EP0283398 | 21.09.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8703657 | 17.03.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3874173T | 08.04.1993 | T2 | DE3874173D1 | 08.10.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8703657 | 17.03.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2612682 | 03.12.1993 | B1 | FR2612682 | 23.09.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8703657 | 17.03.1987 |