|
08.03.1995 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1995 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1995 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1994 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1994 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.1994 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.1994 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1994 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.08.1994 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1994 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.08.1994 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1994 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.1994 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.06.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.04.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1994 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1994 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1994 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1994 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.01.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1993 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1993 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.01.1993 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1992 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.1992 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1992 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.12.1991 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1991 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.1991 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.07.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.04.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1991 |
Deletion of the entry relating to the representative (general authorisation) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1990 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1990 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1990 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.06.1990 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.1990 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1990 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
31.01.1990 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.06.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.06.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1989 |
Deletion of the entry relating to the representative ('et al' case) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.1988 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1988 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1988 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1988 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1988 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.1988 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.1988 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.1988 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.1988 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.03.1988 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.03.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |