Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0287420
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.03.1995 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] |
18.07.1991 |
Opposition filed |
published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] |
09.04.1991 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.05.1991 [1991/22] |
08.09.1990 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.10.1990 [1990/43] |
14.06.1989 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.08.1989 [1989/31] |
30.03.1989 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] |
21.03.1989 |
First examination report |
|
03.09.1988 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.10.1988 [1988/42] |
03.09.1988 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.10.1988 [1988/42] |