EP0288354 - Process for manufacturing an optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Utsumi, Kenichi 28-11-101, Sagamigaoka 5-chome Zama-shi Kanagawa 228 / JP | 02 /
Yuasa, Tetsuya Mezondopanse 607 2-7-5, Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243 / JP | 03 /
Goto, Yasuyuki 1-13-10, Morinosato Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-01 / JP | 04 /
Tsugawa, Iwao 616-2, Kanamori Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | 05 /
Koshino, Nagaaki 103-1-302, Higashikibogaoka Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241 / JP | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88400860.8 | 08.04.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | JP19870094296 | 18.04.1987 Original published format: JP 9429687 | [1988/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0288354 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0288354 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0288354 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/26, G11B7/24 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2007/24304 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24306 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24308 (EP,US);
G11B2007/2431 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24312 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24314 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24316 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines optischen Aufzeichnungsmediums | [1988/43] | English: | Process for manufacturing an optical recording medium | [1988/43] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un médium d'enregistrement optique | [1988/43] | Examination procedure | 22.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 27.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0184452 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |