EP0294256 - Electrical cable for transporting power and control current [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/49] | Electrical cable for transporting power and/or control current | ||
[1993/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peroy, Jeannine 1 bis, Rue de Juncassa 65290 Juillan / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | For all designated states Peroy, Jeannine 1 bis, Rue de Juncassa F-65290 Juillan / FR | ||
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states Peroy, François 1 bis, Rue de Juncassa F-65290 Juillan / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peroy, François décédé / FR | [1993/46] |
Former [1988/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Epstein, Henri 13bis, rue de la Cour des Noues 75020 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Epstein, Henri 74 bis rue de Paris F-95680 Montlignon / FR | ||
Former [1988/49] | Morash, Daniel 17, Avenue La Bruyère F-78160 Marly-le-Roi / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401127.1 | 09.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | FR19870007676 | 02.06.1987 Original published format: FR 8707676 | [1988/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0294256 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294256 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01B9/00, H01B7/00 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
H01B9/003 (EP);
H01B7/0045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Kabel zur Übertragung von Starkstrom und Steuerstrom | [1993/46] | English: | Electrical cable for transporting power and control current | [1993/46] | French: | Cable électrique de transport de courant de puissance et de courant de commande | [1993/46] |
Former [1988/49] | Elektrisches Kabel zur Übertragung vom Starkstrom und/oder Steuerstrom | ||
Former [1988/49] | Electrical cable for transporting power and/or control current | ||
Former [1988/49] | Cable électrique de transport de courant de puissance et/ou de courant de commande | Examination procedure | 25.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 07.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.06.1989 | M01   Fee paid on   25.07.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 07.12.1989 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 05.10.1990 | Resumption of proceedings | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.1993 | GR | 18.11.1993 | NL | 18.11.1993 | BE | 31.05.1994 | CH | 31.05.1994 | LI | 31.05.1994 | LU | 31.05.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1995/26] | AT | 18.11.1993 | |
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
BE | 31.05.1994 | ||
CH | 31.05.1994 | ||
LI | 31.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | AT | 18.11.1993 | |
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
CH | 31.05.1994 | ||
LI | 31.05.1994 | ||
Former [1994/39] | AT | 18.11.1993 | |
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 18.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2180731 (DICKINSON HARRY F); | [A]FR1323006 (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | [X]US3128214 (LAY NORMAN R); | [A]US3164669 (LOUIS MEYERHOFF); | [A]GB2059670 (PILLER GMBH CO KG ANTON) | Examination | US3922465 | GB2108982 |