EP0294257 - Filter incorporating a degassing opening to be placed in ostomy bags during their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/49] | Filter system incorporating a degassing opening to be placed in ostomy bags during their manufacture | ||
[1991/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATOIRES BIOTROL S.A. 1, rue du Foin 75140 Paris Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states LABORATOIRES BIOTROL S.A. 1, rue du Foin F-75140 Paris Cedex 03 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holtermann, Henri 12 Avenue Pierre Loti F-64500 St-Jean de Luz / FR | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401129.7 | 09.05.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | FR19870006797 | 14.05.1987 Original published format: FR 8706797 | [1988/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0294257 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0294257 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/441 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
A61F5/441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1988/49] | Title | German: | Ostomiebeutel mit einem während der Hestellung eingebanten Filter mit Gasaustrittsöffnung | [1988/49] | English: | Filter incorporating a degassing opening to be placed in ostomy bags during their manufacture | [1991/41] | French: | Filtre à évent de dégazage incorporé, destiné à être monté dans des poches de drainage d'anus artificiels au cours de leur fabrication | [1991/41] |
Former [1988/49] | Filter system incorporating a degassing opening to be placed in ostomy bags during their manufacture | ||
Former [1988/49] | Système de filtre à évent de dégazage incorporé, destiné à être monté dans des poches de drainage d'anus artificiels au cours de leur fabrication | Examination procedure | 05.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2350832 (ANVAR [FR]); | [A]EP0037944 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [A]EP0064044 (SVEN HAGBERG LAKARPRAKTIK AB [SE]); | [AD]EP0068964 (BIOTROL SA LAB [FR]); | [A]US4367742 (ORNSTEIN MURRAY [US]); | [E]EP0235928 (COLOPLAST AS [DK]) |