EP0296901 - Sealing joint between a supporting frame and a movable plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANDARD PRODUCTS ATLANTIC Société anonyme 105 Boulevard de Verdun F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1988/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paris, Roland L'Olonnière F-35500 Erbrée / FR | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401232.9 | 20.05.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | FR19870007948 | 05.06.1987 Original published format: FR 8707948 | FR19870010073 | 16.07.1987 Original published format: FR 8710073 | [1988/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296901 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0296901 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/06 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
F16B5/0635 (EP);
B60J10/16 (EP);
B60J10/24 (EP);
B60J10/32 (EP);
B60J10/33 (EP);
B60J10/80 (EP);
F16B5/121 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/52] | Title | German: | Dichtungsprofil zwischen einem tragenden Rahmengestell und einer beweglichen Platte | [1988/52] | English: | Sealing joint between a supporting frame and a movable plate | [1988/52] | French: | Joint d' étanchéité entre un bâti support et un panneau mobile | [1988/52] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 29.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.1991 | GR | 11.09.1991 | NL | 11.09.1991 | SE | 11.09.1991 | CH | 31.05.1992 | LI | 31.05.1992 | LU | 31.05.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 11.09.1991 | |
NL | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
CH | 31.05.1992 | ||
LI | 31.05.1992 | ||
LU | 31.05.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | AT | 11.09.1991 | |
NL | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
CH | 31.05.1992 | ||
LI | 31.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 11.09.1991 | |
NL | 11.09.1991 | ||
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/20] | NL | 11.09.1991 | |
SE | 11.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/15] | NL | 11.09.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2580999 ; | [XP]EP0241264 ; | [A]FR2467960 ; | [AD]FR2492939 ; | [AD]DE1812484 |