EP0295170 - Device for unpiling relatively flat articles such as letters or mail envelopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERTIN & CIE Zone Industrielle Boîte postale 3 F-78373 Plaisir Cédex / FR | [1992/02] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states BERTIN & CIE B.P. No. 73 F-78373 Plaisir Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Volat, Jean-Pierre 29, rue Irma Moreau F-13100 Aix en Provence / FR | [1988/50] | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | Ramey, Daniel Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401308.7 | 27.05.1988 | [1988/50] | Priority number, date | FR19870007527 | 27.05.1987 Original published format: FR 8707527 | [1988/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295170 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295170 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/08, B65H5/08, B07C1/02 | [1988/50] | CPC: |
B65H5/08 (EP,US);
B07C1/025 (EP,US);
B65H3/0808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entstapeln von verhältnismässig flachen Gegenständen, wie Briefen oder Postumschlägen | [1988/50] | English: | Device for unpiling relatively flat articles such as letters or mail envelopes | [1988/50] | French: | Dispositif de dépilage d'objets relativement plats, tels que des lettres ou des plis postaux | [1988/50] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 25.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 11.12.1991 | SE | 11.12.1991 | [2000/04] |
Former [1992/28] | SE | 11.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH340838 (SPIESS GEORG DR ING [DE]); | [X]FR2123659 (THOMSON HOUSTON HOTCHKIS); | [Y]DE2249412 (MABEG MASCHINENBAU GMBH NACHF); | [Y]US3866764 (LEISER HERMANN); | [X]US4346876 (GUENTHER KENNETH L, et al) |