EP0296924 - Optical method for the quality control of textile surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT TEXTILE DE FRANCE 35, rue des Abondances, B.P. 79 92105 Boulogne-Billancourt Cédex / FR | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE HAUTE ALSACE 2, rue des frères Lumière F-68093 Mulhouse Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | For all designated states INSTITUT TEXTILE DE FRANCE 35, rue des Abondances, B.P. 79 F-92105 Boulogne-Billancourt Cédex / FR | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE HAUTE ALSACE 2, rue des frères Lumière F-68093 Mulhouse Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Exbrayat, Pierre Elisée 11, rue Jean Montavont F-68200 Mulhouse / FR | 02 /
Gresser, Julien 3, rue des Oeillets F-68170 Rixheim / FR | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | Bertrand, Didier, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401422.6 | 10.06.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | FR19870008398 | 16.06.1987 Original published format: FR 8708398 | [1988/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296924 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
D06H3/08 (EP);
G01N21/95623 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/52] | Title | German: | Optisches Verfahren zur Prüfung von Gewebeoberflächen | [1988/52] | English: | Optical method for the quality control of textile surfaces | [1988/52] | French: | Procédé optique de contrôle de surfaces textiles | [1988/52] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/23] | 03.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3633037 ; | [Y]US3614232 ; | [X]DE2707538 | [X] - OPTICAL ENGINEERING, vol. 24, no. 5, septembre-octobre 1985, pages 731-734, Bellingham, Washington, US; R.L. FUSEK et al.: "Holographic optical processing for submicrometer defect detection" | [X] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 25, no. 23, 1er décembre 1986, pages 4473-4475, Washington, DC, US; S. VALLMITJANA et al.: "New multiple matched filter: design and experimental realization" | [A] - OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 47, no. 3, septembre 1983, pages 177-182, North-Holland, Amsterdam, NL; C. FERREIRA et al.: "Character recognition: A new multiple filter" |