EP0296944 - Method of processing gaseous effluents coming from the production of electronic components and incinerator for carrying out this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rufin, Denis 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | 02 /
Hirase, Ikuo 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [1988/52] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [1988/52] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401499.4 | 16.06.1988 | [1988/52] | Priority number, date | FR19870008667 | 19.06.1987 Original published format: FR 8708667 | [1988/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296944 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0296944 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F23G7/06 | [1988/52] | CPC: |
F23G7/06 (EP,US);
B01D53/34 (KR);
F23G2209/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Gasen, die bei der Fabrikation von Elektronik-Bauteilen freikommen, und Verbrennungsvorrichtung für die Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1988/52] | English: | Method of processing gaseous effluents coming from the production of electronic components and incinerator for carrying out this method | [1988/52] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'effluents gazeux provenant de la fabrication de composants électroniques et appareil d'incinération pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1988/52] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 05.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/37] | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0160524 (TOYO SANSO CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]DE3338888 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]DE1277209 (BRITISH TITAN PRODUCTS); | [A]FR1415062 (CABOT CORP); | [A]EP0021321 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]FR1603910 |