blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0329909

EP0329909 - Bulge indicating method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.06.1992
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.1992Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.08.1992 [1992/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gupta, Bal K.A.
45 Rossburn Drive Etobicoke
Ontario M9C 2P9 / CA
For all designated states
Mader, David L.
1294 Islington Avenue Apt. 704 Islington
Ontario M9A 3K2 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1989/35]For all designated states
Gupta, Bal K.A.
45 Rossburn Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 2P9 / CA
For all designated states
Mader, David L.
1294 Islington Avenue Apt. 704
Islington Ontario M9A 3K2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1989/35]
Representative(s)Rodhain, Claude
Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1989/35]Rodhain, Claude
Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey
F-75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date88401662.729.06.1988
[1989/35]
Priority number, dateUS1988015933423.02.1988         Original published format: US 159334
[1989/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0329909
Date:30.08.1989
Language:EN
[1989/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.1989
ClassificationIPC:H01G1/11
[1989/35]
CPC:
H01G2/14 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Anzeige des Durchhangs und Vorrichtung[1989/35]
English:Bulge indicating method and device[1989/35]
French:Méthode indiquant un renflement et dispositif[1989/35]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure11.07.1989Request for accelerated examination filed
21.09.1989Examination requested  [1989/51]
09.03.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.1990Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
25.06.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.11.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.1991Fee for grant paid
25.01.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.01.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/32]
18.02.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1992/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.07.199104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3642575  (BURKON METALLWARENFABRIK GMBH);
 [A]EP0021522  (PHILIPS CORP [US]);
 [A]FR2494029  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]US4067154  (FIKE JR LESTER LYMAN)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.