Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] |
18.12.1990 | Change - representative | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] |
08.05.1990 | First examination report | |
10.02.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.03.1989 [1989/13] |
26.11.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.01.1989 [1989/02] |