EP0298863 - Self-carrying plane reticular structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daouk, Fouad 7 rue Masséna F-59800 Lille / FR | [1989/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1991/06] |
Former [1989/02] | Ecrepont, Robert Cabinet Ecrepont 12 Place Simon Vollant F-59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401757.5 | 05.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | FR19870010082 | 07.07.1987 Original published format: FR 8710082 | [1989/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298863 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04B7/02 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
E04B1/24 (EP);
E04B2001/0084 (EP);
E04B2001/2406 (EP);
E04B2001/2448 (EP);
E04B2001/249 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | Selbsttragendes flaches netzartiges Gefüge | [1989/02] | English: | Self-carrying plane reticular structure | [1989/02] | French: | Structure réticulée plane autoporteuse | [1989/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/18] | 08.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1191400 ; | [Y]FR942168 ; | [A]US3323820 ; | [AD]US3354590 |