EP0300871 - Mixer for doughy material, especially bread dough [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DITO-SAMA 39 rue de Beauze F-23200 Aubusson Creuse / FR | For all designated states LOISELET, Michel Résidence Le Chantilly 7, avenue du Général de Gaulle - App. 47 F-30100 Ales (Gard) / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states DITO-SAMA 39 rue de Beauze F-23200 Aubusson Creuse / FR | ||
For all designated states LOISELET, Michel Résidence Le Chantilly 7, avenue du Général de Gaulle - App. 47 F-30100 Ales (Gard) / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loiselet, Michel 7 avenue du Gal.de Gaulle Residence "Le Chantilly", 30100 Ales / FR | 02 /
Musseau, Joel c/o Dito Sama F-23200 Aubusson / FR | [1989/15] |
Former [1989/14] | 01 /
Loiselet, Michel 7 avenue du Gal.de Gaulle Residence "Le Chantilly", 30100 Ales / FR | ||
02 /
Musseau, Joel c/o Dito Sima F-23200 Aubusson / FR | |||
Former [1989/04] | 01 /
Loiselet, Michel 7 avenue du Gal.de Gaulle Residence "Le Chantilly", 30100 Ales / FR | Representative(s) | Bressand, Georges, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | Bressand, Georges, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401769.0 | 06.07.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | FR19870009710 | 08.07.1987 Original published format: FR 8709710 | [1989/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0300871 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300871 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A21C1/14 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
A21C1/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Mischmaschine für Teigmaterial, insbesondere für Brotteig | [1989/04] | English: | Mixer for doughy material, especially bread dough | [1989/04] | French: | Pétrin pour matériau pâteux, notamment pour pâte à pain | [1989/04] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 11.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.1992 | GB | 02.01.1992 | NL | 02.01.1992 | SE | 02.01.1992 | [1993/13] |
Former [1992/46] | AT | 02.01.1992 | |
NL | 02.01.1992 | ||
SE | 02.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | NL | 02.01.1992 | |
SE | 02.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 02.01.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE424936 ; | [A]FR419640 (ERNEST CORSE [FR]); | [A]US2137558 (EMIL AESCHBACH) |