EP0305251 - Injector mixer under pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. + M. Lamort Société Anonyme dite: rue de la Fontaine Ludot F-51300 Vitry-le-François / FR | For all designated states Stora Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft Feldmühleplatz 1 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states E. + M. Lamort Société Anonyme dite: rue de la Fontaine Ludot F-51300 Vitry-le-François / FR | ||
For all designated states Stora Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft Feldmühleplatz 1 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states E. + M. Lamort Société Anonyme dite: rue de la Fontaine Ludot F-51300 Vitry-le-François / FR | ||
For all designated states Feldmühle Aktiengesellschaft Fritz-Vomfelde-Platz 4 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lamort, Jean-Pierre 3 boulevard Carnot F-51300 Vitry le François / FR | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Loyer, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Loyer, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402000.9 | 01.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | FR19870011273 | 07.08.1987 Original published format: FR 8711273 | [1989/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305251 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305251 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/04 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
B01F25/3121 (EP,US);
Y10S261/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/09] | Title | German: | Injektormischer unter Druck | [1989/09] | English: | Injector mixer under pressure | [1989/09] | French: | Injecteur mélangeur sous pression | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/16] | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB577397 (HENRY ALFRED ERNEST TALLEY); | [A]GB802691 (GASKELL & CHAMBERS LTD); | [A]DE2345246 (BRAUKMANN HEINRICH); | [A]GB1385166 (POPOV V F); | [A]CH585064 (LENZBURG SAUERSTOFFWERK AG); | [A]US4210166 (MUNIE JULIUS C [US]); | [A]FR2459679 (MATINCENDIE SA); | [X]FR2521869 (DEBRECENI MEZOEGAZDASAGI [HU]) |