EP0307292 - Device for producing and circulating a liquid electrolyte in an activatable alkaline cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.05.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1995 | Change - rejection of opposition | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETAT-FRANCAIS représenté par le DELEGUE GENERAL POUR L'ARMEMENT (DPAG) Bureau des Brevets et Inventions de la Délégation Générale pour l'Armement 26, Boulevard Victor F-75996 Paris Armées / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states ETAT-FRANCAIS représenté par le DELEGUE GENERAL POUR L'ARMEMENT (DPAG) Bureau des Brevets et Inventions de la Délégation Générale pour l'Armement 26, Boulevard Victor F-75996 Paris Armées / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charlot, Yves Allée de l'Eglantine La Roseraie La-Querencia F-83240 Cavalaire / FR | 02 /
Carmillet, Jean-Pierre 13, Impasse des Mésanges F-83120 Sainte-Maxime / FR | 03 /
Manent, Bernard Lotissement Caillat 7, rue Jean Giono F-83310 Cogolin / FR | 04 /
Potiron, André 15, Les Nouveaux Horizons F-78000 Elancourt / FR | [1989/11] | Application number, filing date | 88402218.7 | 02.09.1988 | [1989/11] | Priority number, date | FR19870012236 | 03.09.1987 Original published format: FR 8712236 | [1989/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307292 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307292 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/34 | [1989/11] | CPC: |
H01M6/34 (EP);
H01M50/77 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/11] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Herstellung und Umwälzung eines flüssigen Elektrolyten in einer alkalischen Zelle | [1989/11] | English: | Device for producing and circulating a liquid electrolyte in an activatable alkaline cell | [1989/11] | French: | Dispositif pour former et faire circuler un électrolyte liquide dans une pile alcaline amorcable | [1989/11] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 08.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.06.1993
03.09.1993
ADMISSIBLE Whitehead Spa Via di Levante 48 57128 Livorno / IT Opponent's representative Cerbaro, Elena Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.06.1993
03.09.1993
ADMISSIBLE Whitehead Spa Via di Levante 48 57128 Livorno / IT Opponent's representative Cerbaro, Elena c/o Studio Torta, Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | 29.07.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.11.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.12.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 21.02.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 25.11.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/27] | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.02.1995 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.02.1995 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP601764 ; | [A]JP57103271 ; | [Y]US3941616 (HUHTA-KOWISTO ESKO ENSIO); | [Y]US3510361 (SAUNDERS LAWRENCE L); | [P]EP0268828 (SAFT SA [FR]); | [A]US4012234 (KRAFT DENNIS W); | [A]US4198474 (SHAH PINAKIN M [US]); | [A]EP0067703 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US2953111 (LESLIE JONES JOHN); | [A]WO8402428 (GOULD INC [US]) | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 110 (E-314)[1833], 15 mai 1985; & JP-A-60 1764 (NIHON DENCHI K.K.) 07-01-1985, & JP601764 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 189 (E-133)[1067], 28 septembre 1982; & JP-A-57 103 271 (YUASA DENCHI K.K.) 26-06-1982, & JP57103271 A 00000000 |