EP0311473 - Fluorinated derivate of amino acids, useful as tensioactive or cotensioactive agents, and preparations for biomedical use containing these derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLICATIONS ET TRANSFERTS DE TECHNOLOGIES AVANCEES ATTA 47, Corniche des Oliviers F-06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states APPLICATIONS ET TRANSFERTS DE TECHNOLOGIES AVANCEES ATTA 47, Corniche des Oliviers F-06000 Nice / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riess, Jean Les Giaines F-06950 Falicon / FR | 02 /
Blaignon, Christine 27, Rue Durand de Sartoux F-06370 Mouans Sartoux / FR | 03 /
Le Blanc, Maurice 10, Avenue de Brancolar F-06100 Nice / FR | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1989/15] | Application number, filing date | 88402310.2 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | FR19870012815 | 16.09.1987 Original published format: FR 8712815 | [1989/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0311473 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C101/10, C07C103/46, A61K9/00, A61K47/00 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
A61K9/0026 (EP);
A61P7/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07C247/00 (EP);
C07J41/0061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/15] | Title | German: | Fluorierte Derivate von Aminosäure, verwendbar als tensioaktive oder cotensioaktive Agenzien und diese Derivate enthaltende Zusammensetzungen für biomedizinische Verwendung | [1989/15] | English: | Fluorinated derivate of amino acids, useful as tensioactive or cotensioactive agents, and preparations for biomedical use containing these derivatives | [1989/15] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés fluorés d'acides aminés, utilisables en particulier comme agents tensioactifs ou contensioactifs, et préparations à usage biomédical comprenant ces dérivés | [1989/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 25.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/42] | 31.05.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP8035020 ; | [X]JP62189460 ; | [X]JP6206255 ; | [X]JP59187047 ; | [X]GB773326 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [X]FR2014891 (ALLIED CHEM); | [X]DE2239709 (PENNWALT CORP); | [X]FR2207187 (DU PONT [US]); | [X]US3839425 (BARTLETT P); | [X]DE2758013 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [X]US4126633 (TOUKAN SAMEEH S, et al); | [X]GB2060922 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]GB2062271 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]FR2488700 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0051526 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]); | [X]EP0102240 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [X]DE3538836 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | [X] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 32, février 1967, pages 430-434; N.O. BRACE: "Alpha-amino alkanoic and alkenoic acids with perfluoroalkyl terminal segments" | [X] - ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, vol. 79, no. 17/18, 1967, pages 822-823, Weinheim, DE; W. STEGLICH et al.: "Allgemeine Methode zur Darstellung von beta-Perfluoralkyl-alaninen" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 87, no. 9, 1977, page 584, résumé no. 68600x, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y. MAKI et al.: "Synthesis of fluorine-containing DL-alanine derivatives", & YUKI GOSEI KAGAKU KYOKAI SHI 1976, 34(10), 722-5 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 13, 29 septembre 1980, page 624, résumé no. 132085m, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-80 35 020 (NEOS CO., LTD) 11-03-1980, & JP8035020 A 00000000 | [X] - NATURE, vol. 318, 28 novembre 1985, pages 353-356; E.M. LANDAU et al.: "Transfer of structural information from Langmuir monolayers to three-dimensional growing crystals" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, 1988, page 602, résumé no. 140672u, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 189 460 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO INDUSTRY CO., LTD) 19-08-1987, & JP62189460 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, 1987, page 742, résumé no. 165334c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 06 255 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD) 13-01-1987, & JP6206255 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, 1985, page 75, résumé no. 133509u, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 187 047 (NIPPON MECTRON CO., LTD) 24-10-1984, & JP59187047 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, 1979, page 346, résumé no. 44852n, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. KUNIEDA et al.: "The lowering of air-water and oil-water interfacial tensions by fluorinated and ordinary hydrecarbon surfactant solutions and spreading of aqueous solutions over the oil surface", & NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI 1979, (5), 561-7 |