EP0308337 - 4-Aminopyridine derivatives and their acid addition salts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ninomiya, Kunihiro 4-12-15 Minami-Naruse Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Saito, Ken-Ichi 15-301 Machida-Kooputaun 2-10-4 Ogawa Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Morita, Shuji 5-1, Tsutsujigaoka Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Tobe, Akihiro B-211 Mitsubishi Kasei-Sakuradai-Apaato 3- Sakuradai Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Nitta, Issei 4-13-22 Narusedai Machida-shi Tokyo / JP | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Peaucelle, Chantal, et al S.C. Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud 67, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Peaucelle, Chantal, et al S.C. Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud 67, boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402333.4 | 15.09.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | JP19870233350 | 17.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23335087 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0308337 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0308337 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0308337 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/06, C07K5/08, C07D401/14, // A61K37/02 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
C07K5/0821 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (KR);
A61K31/44 (KR);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D401/14 (KR);
C07K5/06139 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | 4-Aminopyridin-Derivate und ihre Saueradditionssalze | [1989/12] | English: | 4-Aminopyridine derivatives and their acid addition salts | [1989/12] | French: | Dérivés de 4-aminopyridine et leurs sels d'addition acides | [1989/12] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 05.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0144230 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al); | [A]EP0217688 (ADIR [FR]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE SERBIAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 50, no. 6, 1985, pages 283-289, Belgrado, YU; A.M. EL-NAGGAR et al.: "The synthesis and biological activity of some new 4-(aminoacyl)aminopyridines and 2-(aminoacyl)aminopyrimidine derivatives" |