EP0311476 - Metallized particles of crosslinked functional polymers, their preparation and their use in producing electroconductive materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1993 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charmot, Dominique 18, rue Mathis F-75019 Paris / FR | 02 /
Fiard, Jean-François 16, rue des Orteaux F-75020 Paris / FR | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Seugnet, Jean Louis, et al RHODIA Chimie Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Seugnet, Jean Louis, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1990/17] | Vignally, Noel Rhône-Poulenc Chimie Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches de Saint-Fons B.P. 62 F-69190 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1989/15] | Fabre, Madeleine-France RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402406.8 | 23.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | FR19870013712 | 05.10.1987 Original published format: FR 8713712 | [1989/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0311476 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/08, C08K9/12, H01B1/22, C09D5/24 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,US);
C08K9/12 (EP,US);
C09D5/24 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/15] | Title | German: | Metallisierte Teilchen aus funktionalisierten vernetzten Polymeren, ihr Herstellungsverfahren und ihre Anwendung bei der Herstellung elektrisch leitender Materialien | [1989/15] | English: | Metallized particles of crosslinked functional polymers, their preparation and their use in producing electroconductive materials | [1989/15] | French: | Particules métallisées de polymère fonctionnalisé réticulé, leur procédé de préparation et leur application à la fabrication de matériaux électro-conducteurs | [1989/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 23.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/31] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61133243 ; | [AD]JP60262846 ; | [A]JP5749632 ; | [Y]US3890281 (ANGSTADT HOWARD P, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 321 (C-382)[2377], 31 octobre 1986; & JP-A-61 133 243 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO. LTD) 20-06-1986, & JP61133243 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 139 (C-348)[2196], 22 mai 1986; & JP-A-60 262 846 (MITSUBISHI RAYON K.K.) 26-12-1985, & JP60262846 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 122 (C-112)[1000], 7 juillet 1982; & JP-A-57 49 632 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 23-03-1982, & JP5749632 A 00000000 |