EP0319353 - A process for the production of biologically active peptide via the expression of modified storage seed protein genes in transgenic plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLANT GENETIC SYSTEMS N.V. Kunstlaan Avenue des Arts, 46 1040 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states PLANT GENETIC SYSTEMS N.V. Kunstlaan Avenue des Arts, 46 B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vandekerckhove, Joel Stefaan Rode Beukendreef 27 B-8021 Loppem / BE | 02 /
Krebbers, Enno 1724 Glenview Alhambra, CA 91803 / US | 03 /
Botterman, Johan Het Wijngaardeke 5 B-9721 Zevergem-De Pinte / BE | 04 /
Leemans, Jan P. de Denterghemlaan 2 B-9831 Deurle / BE | [1996/40] |
Former [1989/23] | 01 /
Vandekerckhove, Joel Stefaan Rode Beukendreef 27 B-8021 Loppem / BE | ||
02 /
Krebbers, Enno 1724 Glenview Alhambra California 91803 / US | |||
03 /
Botterman, Johan Het Wijngaardeke 5 B-9721 Zevergem-De Pinte / BE | |||
04 /
Leemans, Jan P. de Denterghemlaan 2 B-9831 Deurle / BE | Representative(s) | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402646.9 | 20.10.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | EP19870402348 | 20.10.1987 Original published format: EP 87402348 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319353 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319353 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C12N15/82, C07K14/415, C07K14/60, C07K14/70 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
C12N15/8251 (EP);
C07K14/00 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP);
C07K14/60 (EP);
C07K14/70 (EP);
C12N15/8234 (EP);
C12N15/8253 (EP);
C12N15/8254 (EP);
C12N15/8257 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/23] | C12P21/02, C12N15/00, C12N5/00, A01H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines biologisch-aktiven Peptides durch Expression von modifizierten Speicherproteingenen in transgenetischen Pflanzen | [1989/23] | English: | A process for the production of biologically active peptide via the expression of modified storage seed protein genes in transgenic plants | [1989/23] | French: | Procédé pour la production de peptide biologiquement actif par l'expression de gènes de protéines de réserves modifiées dans les plantes transgèniques | [1989/23] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/40: Teilanmeldung 96100523.8 eingereicht am 16/01/96 | EPB 1996/40: Divisional application 96100523.8 filed on 16/01/96 | EPB 1996/40: Demande divisionnaire 96100523.8 déposée le 16/01/96 | Examination procedure | 04.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 21.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 17.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96100523.8 / EP0723019 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Request for further processing for: | 26.05.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.06.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.10.1996 | CH | 02.10.1996 | ES | 02.10.1996 | GR | 02.10.1996 | IT | 02.10.1996 | LI | 02.10.1996 | LU | 31.10.1996 | SE | 02.01.1997 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
ES | 02.10.1996 | ||
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
CH | 07.01.1997 | ||
LI | 07.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 02.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD240911 ; | [A]WO8700865 ; | [A]EP0142924 ; | [A]WO8301176 ; | [A]EP0208418 ; | [A]EP0067553 ; | [A]GB2068971 ; | [XP]WO8707299 | [XO] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 0, no. 10, part D, page 53, abstract no. N137; D. DONALDSON et al.: "Expression of seed storage proteins in xenopus ocytes" | [A] - PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 8, no. 3, 1987, pages 239-250, Martinus Nijhoff Publishers, Dordrecht, NL; S.B. ALTENBACH et al.: "Cloning and sequence analysis of a cDNA encoding a brazil nut protein exceptionally rich in methionine" | [A] - BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, vol. 5, 1987, pages 29-45, Pergamon Journals Ltd, GB; J.L. SLIGHTON et al.: "Advances in the molecular biology pf plant seed storage proteins" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, vol. 83, November 1986, pages 8240-8244; J.K. OKAMURO et al.: "Soybean seed lectin gene and flanking nonseed protein genes are developmentally regulated in transformed tobacco plants" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, vol. 82, May 1985, pages 3320-3324; C. SENGUPTA-GOPALAN et al.: "Developmentally regulated expression of the beab beta-phaseolin gene in tobacco seed" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, vol. 84, August 1987, pages 5525-5529, US; C.D. DICKINSON et al.: "Self-assembly of proglycinin and hybrid proglycinin synthesized in vitro from cDNA" | [A] - TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 4, December 1986, pages 314-320; J.M. JAYNES et al.: "Reviews: Plant protein improvement by genetic engineering: use of synthetic genes" | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 262, no. 25, 5th September 1987, pages 12202-12208, The American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, Inc., US; S.R. SCOFIELD et al.: "Nucleotide sequence of a member of the napin storage protein family from Brassica napus" | [XP] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 4, 15th August 1988, abstract no. 34125, Philadelphia, PA, US; S.E. RADKE et al.: "Transformation of Brassica napus L. using Agrobacterium tumefaciens: developmentally regulated expression of a reintroduced napin gene", & THEOR. APPL. GENET. 75(5): 685-694, 1988 | [A] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 12, 1988, abstract no. 124569, Philadelphia, PA, US; E. KREBBERS et al.: "Determination of the processing sites of an Arabidopsis 2S albumin and characterization of the complete gene family", PLANT PHYSIOL. (BETHESDA) 87(4): 859-866, 1988 | [AP] - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, 17TH ANNUAL MEETING, UCLA SYMPOSIA ON MOLECULAR & CELLULAR BIOLOGY, 28th February - 10th April 1988, suppl. 12C, page 177, abstract no. L300, Alan R. Liss, Inc., New York, US; S.B. ALTENBACH et al.: "Processing of a new brazil nut sulfur-rich seed protein in transgenic plants" | [A] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, no. 33007933, Philadelphia, PA, US; S.B. ALTENBACH et al.: "Transfer of a sulfur-rich protein gene from brazil nuts to other plants", & J. CELL. BIOCHEM. SUPPL. 1987. VOL. 0(11) PART B, P46 | [A] - BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 4, June 1986, pages 565-568; T. KEMPE et al.: "Production and characterization of growth hormone releasing factor analogs through recombinant DNA and chemical techniques" | Examination | - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 262, no. 25, 05 September 1987, American Society for Biochemistry & Molecular Biology Inc., US; S.R. SCOFIELD et al., pp. 12202-12208 |