EP0309363 - Hip prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Demeulenaere, Claude Montplaisir 7 - 28, rue Wauthier F-78100 St-Germain-en-Laye / FR | [1989/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Bruder 46 Rue Decamps F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402717.8 | 03.04.1987 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | FR19860004874 | 04.04.1986 Original published format: FR 8604874 | [1989/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309363 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/36 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
A61F2/32 (EP);
A61B17/8066 (EP);
A61F2002/30339 (EP);
A61F2002/30576 (EP);
A61F2002/30578 (EP);
A61F2002/30604 (EP);
A61F2002/30902 (EP);
A61F2002/30904 (EP);
A61F2002/3425 (EP);
A61F2002/3432 (EP);
A61F2002/3443 (EP);
A61F2002/3625 (EP);
A61F2002/3631 (EP);
A61F2002/365 (EP);
A61F2002/3652 (EP);
A61F2220/0033 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/13] | Title | German: | Hüftprothese | [1989/13] | English: | Hip prosthesis | [1989/13] | French: | Prothèse de hanche | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/20] | 28.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87400737.0 / EP0241361 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3840904 (TRONZO R); | [A]EP0099167 (CARBOMEDICS INC [US]); | [YP]EP0201407 |