EP0317412 - Composed die set for drawing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHAUSSON INGENIERIE 28 rue des Frères Chausson 92600 Asnieres (Hauts de Seine) / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states CHAUSSON INGENIERIE 28 rue des Frères Chausson F-92600 ASNIERES, Hauts de Seine / FR | ||
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME DES USINES CHAUSSON 11 Avenue Dubonnet F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorin, Gilbert Le Miroir 1 avenue Becquerelle F-92600 Asnières / FR | 02 /
Monza, Gérard 9 rue Henri Dunant F-95580 Margency / FR | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Madeuf, René Louis, et al Cabinet Madeuf 7, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Madeuf, René Louis, et al Cabinet Madeuf, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 3, Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402846.5 | 14.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | FR19870015710 | 13.11.1987 Original published format: FR 8715710 | [1989/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317412 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317412 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B21D37/20 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
B21D37/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1989/21] | Title | German: | Zusammengesetztes Ziehwerkzeug für eine Ziehpresse | [1989/21] | English: | Composed die set for drawing press | [1989/21] | French: | Jeu d'outils composites pour presse d'emboutissage | [1989/21] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 18.05.1994 | [1995/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58151925 ; | [X]FR2221201 ; | [X]EP0170374 ; | [A]US3239590 ; | [A]US1935916 ; | [A]FR2314803 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 271 (M-260)[1416], 3 décembre 1983, page 144 M 260; & JP-A-58 151 925 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) 09-09-1983, & JP58151925 A 00000000 |