EP0318378 - Self-stabilized latched differential comparator with a single clock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON COMPOSANTS MICROONDES 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states THOMSON COMPOSANTS MICROONDES 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states THOMSON HYBRIDES ET MICROONDES 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, François THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Campagnie, Bertrand THOMSON-CSF SCPI 19, avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Taboureau, James, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud 92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | Taboureau, James, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402948.9 | 24.11.1988 | [1989/22] | Priority number, date | FR19870016465 | 27.11.1987 Original published format: FR 8716465 | [1989/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0318378 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318378 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/356 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
H03K3/356034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL [1989/22] | Title | German: | Selbststabilisierter verriegelter Differentialkomparator mit nur einem Taktsignal | [1989/22] | English: | Self-stabilized latched differential comparator with a single clock | [1989/22] | French: | Comparateur différentiel latché autostabilisé à horloge unique | [1989/22] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 20.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3442649 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]US3540007 (HODGES DAVID A) | [Y] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-12, no. 5, octobre 1977, pages 497-501, IEEE, New York, US; T.R. O'CONNELL et al.: "Two static 4K clocked and nonclocked RAM designs" | [A] - IEEE 1983 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, Newport Beach, California, 2-4 mai 1983, vol. 3, pages 1286-1289, IEEE, New York, US; P.E. ALLEN: "Automated design of MOS of amps" |