EP0321341 - Device for fixing pipes passing through a wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masini, Jean-Jacques 35, Rue Jean Penet F-69630 Chaponost / FR | 02 /
Chapidon, René 29, Avenue des Pépinières Clos-Rival F-69230 Saint-Genis-Laval / FR | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Leboulenger, Jean, et al Atofina D.C.R.D./D.P.I. 4, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris la Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Leboulenger, Jean, et al ATOCHEM Département Propriété Industrielle F-92091 Paris la Défense 10 Cédex 42 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88403184.0 | 14.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | FR19870017655 | 17.12.1987 Original published format: FR 8717655 | [1989/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0321341 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321341 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L27/04 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
F16L49/08 (EP,US);
F16L5/00 (KR);
F16L27/053 (EP,US);
F16L35/00 (KR);
Y10S285/911 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Befestigen von Rohren die durch eine Wand gehen | [1989/25] | English: | Device for fixing pipes passing through a wall | [1989/25] | French: | Dispositif pour fixation de tubes traversant une paroi | [1989/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/25] | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 16.10.1991 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2983528 (STEIDLE WALLACE E); | [A]DE1988015U (HEINRICH BRINKMANN K G [DE]); | [A]AT265773B (BAUER ROEHREN PUMPEN); | [A]FR2181117 (BANIDES ET DEBEAURAIN [FR]); | [X]DE2435976 (UGINE KUHLMANN); | [A]FR2287640 (HYDROTECH INT INC [US]) |