EP0325067 - New sugar-containing chewing gum compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRAFT GENERAL FOODS FRANCE 6, Rue Lionel Terray F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [1992/51] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states GENERAL FOODS FRANCE 6, Rue Lionel Terray F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Evelyne 22, Avenue du Petit Parc F-94300 Vincennes / FR | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/30] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88403212.9 | 16.12.1988 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | FR19870017893 | 22.12.1987 Original published format: FR 8717893 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0325067 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325067 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/30 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
A23G4/06 (EP);
A23G4/08 (EP);
A23G4/10 (EP);
B65D85/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/30] | Title | German: | Zucker enthaltende Kaugummimassen | [1989/30] | English: | New sugar-containing chewing gum compositions | [1989/30] | French: | Compositions de gomme à mâcher contenant du sucre | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4271199 ; | [Y]EP0102081 ; | [X]GB2066044 ; | [X]US4352823 ; | [Y]US4166134 ; | [A]EP0086769 |