EP0323311 - Process for the fabrication of adhesives based on aqueous urea-formaldehyde resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/27] | Process for the fabrication of urea-formaldehyde resins | ||
[1995/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states NORSOLOR S.A. Tour Aurore Place des Reflets F-92080 Paris la Défense Cédex 5 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garrigue, Roger 23, rue du Capitaine Escudié F-31000 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
Lalo, Jack 116, avenue Saint Exupéry F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Leclere, Jean-Luc Chemin du Gastou F-31190 Miremont / FR | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 F-92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | ||
Former [1991/01] | Rochet, Michel ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 F-92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | ||
Former [1989/27] | Rieux, Michel NORSOLOR Service Propriété Industrielle Tour Aurore 18, Place des Reflets Cedex no. 5 F-92080 Paris la Défense 2 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88403234.3 | 19.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | FR19870017996 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: FR 8717996 | [1989/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323311 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323311 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G12/12 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
C08G12/12 (EP,US);
C08L61/24 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24066 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L61/24, C08L2666/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Klebstoffen auf Basis von wässrigen Harnstoff-Formaldehyd-Harzen | [1995/06] | English: | Process for the fabrication of adhesives based on aqueous urea-formaldehyde resins | [1995/06] | French: | Procédé de fabrication des colles de résines aqueuses urée-formol | [1995/06] |
Former [1989/27] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Harnstoff-Formaldehyd-Harzen | ||
Former [1989/27] | Process for the fabrication of urea-formaldehyde resins | ||
Former [1989/27] | Nouveau procédé de fabrication des résines urée-formol | Examination procedure | 20.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2428752 (STANLEY HEWETT PHILIP); | [A]US3896087 (BRUNNMUELLER FRIEDRICH, et al); | [A]EP0013447 (METHANOL CHEMIE NEDERLAND [NL]); | [A]DD144170 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH); | [X]FR2504542 (BASF AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | JP58147478 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol 7, no. 263 (C-196)(1408) 24 novembre 1983; & JP-A-58 147 478, & JP58147478 A 00000000 |