EP0301984 - Medical examination table for babies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omarouayache, Nour-Eddine Cité Hihl El-Mekki Oum-el-Bouaghi / DZ | For all designated states "SACOPRES-BALDISSERI" Société à Responsabilité Limitée française Z.I. de Forquevaux F-01600 Trevoux / FR | [1989/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omarouayache, Nour-Eddine Cite Hihl El-Mekki Oum-el-Bouaghi / DZ | [1989/05] | Representative(s) | Monnier, Guy Jean, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Monnier, Guy, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 142-150 cours Lafayette BP 3058 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88420269.8 | 27.07.1988 | [1989/05] | Priority number, date | DZ19130000487 | 27.07.1987 Original published format: DZ 13487 | [1989/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0301984 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0301984 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/00 | [1989/05] | CPC: |
A61G13/0018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/05] | Title | German: | Medizinischer Untersuchungstisch für Babys | [1989/05] | English: | Medical examination table for babies | [1989/05] | French: | Table pour examen médical de nourrissons | [1989/05] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/38] | 26.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2243999 ; | [A]US4650299 ; | [A]US3498687 ; | [A]FR689663 |