EP0322326 - Protective coating for studs and emerging parts of prebaked anodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.E.R.S. SOCIETE DES ELECTRODES & REFRACTAIRES SAVOIE Tour Manhattan - La Défense 2 6, place de l'Iris F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1989/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Audras, Gabriel 32, Quai Gailleton F-69002 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Samanos, Bernard 30, rue Claude Jusseaud F-69110 Ste Foy les Lyon / FR | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Séraphin, Léon, et al PECHINEY Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Séraphin, Léon, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88420430.6 | 21.12.1988 | [1989/26] | Priority number, date | FR19870018452 | 22.12.1987 Original published format: FR 8718452 | [1989/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322326 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322326 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/12 | [1989/26] | CPC: |
C25C3/125 (EP);
C25C7/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/26] | Title | German: | Schutzbeschichtung für Zapfen und herausragende Teile von vorgebrannten Anoden | [1989/26] | English: | Protective coating for studs and emerging parts of prebaked anodes | [1989/26] | French: | Perfectionnement aux revêtements de protection des rondins d'anodes précuites et de la partie émergeante de ces anodes | [1989/26] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 12.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BR8500347 ; | [A]DE2306576 ; | [A]EP0056708 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 106, no. 18, mai 1987, page 514, résumé no. 146044w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & BR-A-85 00 347 (ARDAL OG SUNNDAL VERK A/S) 09-09-1986, & BR8500347 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 8, 1985, page 257, résumé no. 57975w, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.I. SPRYGIN et al.: "Magnesian concrete blocks for nonferrous metallurgy mills", & OGNEUPORY 1985, (5), 47-9 |