EP0302804 - Process and device for mechanically crimping a connection piece on the ends of several conductive wires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 28.08.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1995 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'ENTREPRISE INDUSTRIELLE 29 rue de Rome F-75008 Paris / FR | [1995/14] |
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states Ricard, Claude Villa Sainte Magdaleine 52, Cours Gambetta F-13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Wind, Jacques Cabinet Laurent & Charras 20 Rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Wind, Jacques CABINET JACQUES WIND 47, rue Benoit Bennier B.P. 30 F-69751 Charbonnières-les-Bains Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1992/35] | Wind, Jacques CABINET JACQUES WIND, 47, rue Benoit Bennier B.P. 30 F-69751 Charbonnières-Les-Bains Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1991/37] | Wind, Jacques CABINET JACQUES WIND 47, rue Benoit Bennier B.P. 30 F-69751 Charbonnières-les-Bains Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1991/31] | Moretti, René c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado F-13008 Marseille / FR | ||
Former [1989/06] | Azais, Henri c/o CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado F-13008 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 88430021.1 | 22.07.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | FR19870011391 | 07.08.1987 Original published format: FR 8711391 | [1989/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302804 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302804 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/28, B65G17/32 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
H01R43/28 (EP);
B65G17/323 (EP);
B65G2201/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum maschinellen Krimpen eines Verbindungsteiles mit den Enden meherer leitenden Drähte | [1989/06] | English: | Process and device for mechanically crimping a connection piece on the ends of several conductive wires | [1989/06] | French: | Procédés et dispositifs pour sertir mécaniquement une pièce de connexion sur les extrémités de plusieurs fils conducteurs | [1989/06] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/17] | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 14.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.1994
01.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE L'Entreprise Industrielle, S.A. 29, rue de Rome 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Fréchède, Michel, et al, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.1994
01.06.1994
ADMISSIBLE L'Entreprise Industrielle, S.A. 29, rue de Rome 75008 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Fréchède, Michel, et al, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 13.05.1995 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8610436U ; | [A]FR2130212 |