EP0362453 - Wear and ornamental article provided with insertions of a first fur into a second fur [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ste. "FURSKIN" SàRL 8, Boulevard Carnot F-06300 Nice / FR | [1990/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raimondi, Vincent 12 Rue du Poilu F-06230 Villefranche sur Mer / FR | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Bossard, Jacques-René Cabinet MEYER & COURTASSOL Bureau EUROPE 20 Place des Halles 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Bossard, Jacques-René Cabinet MEYER & COURTASSOL Bureau EUROPE 20 Place des Halles F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 88440080.5 | 03.10.1988 | [1990/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0362453 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C14B15/12, A41H41/00 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
C14B15/12 (EP);
A41H41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | Bekleidungs- und Dekorationsartikel mit eingelegten Elementen eines ersten Fells in einem zweiten Fell | [1990/15] | English: | Wear and ornamental article provided with insertions of a first fur into a second fur | [1990/15] | French: | élément d'habillement et d'ornement comportant des incrustations d'une première fourrure dans une seconde fourrure | [1990/15] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/23] | 08.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.11.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8533472U ; | [A]DE8535947U ; | [A]FR2503992 ; | [A]FR1332480 ; | [A]FR714425 |