EP0279761 - Tine for cultivating the soil, and implement equipped with such a tine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE TRASOL S.A.R.L. Route de Cambernard 31470 Saint Lys / FR | For all designated states Michel, Marcel "Lafontanelle" Montpezat d'Agenais F-47360 Prayssas / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states SOCIETE TRASOL S.A.R.L. Route de Cambernard F-31470 Saint Lys / FR | ||
For all designated states Michel, Marcel "Lafontanelle" Montpezat d'Agenais F-47360 Prayssas / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michel, Marcel Lafontanelle Montpezat D'Agenais F-47360 Prayssas / FR | [1988/34] | Representative(s) | Ravina, Bernard Ravina S.A. 8, rue des Briquetiers Z.A. de Font Grasse 31700 Blagnac / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | Ravina, Bernard Cabinet Bernard RAVINA 24, boulevard Riquet F-31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 88450005.9 | 29.01.1988 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | FR19870001306 | 02.02.1987 Original published format: FR 8701306 | [1988/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0279761 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279761 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A01B13/08 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
A01B15/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/34] | Title | German: | Zinke für Bodenbearbeitung und damit ausgerüstete Maschine | [1988/34] | English: | Tine for cultivating the soil, and implement equipped with such a tine | [1988/34] | French: | Dent pour le travail du sol et machine équipée d'une telle dent | [1988/34] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.1990 | 31.01.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.05.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | Licencee: | SOCIETE TRASOL SARL Route de Cambernard F-31470 Saint Lys / FR | Date: | 29.04.1988 |
Former [1988/34] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | SOCIETE TRASOL SARL Route de Cambernard F-31470 Saint Lys / FR | ||
Date: | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.08.1991 | SE | 14.08.1991 | ES | 30.01.1992 | [2004/37] |
Former [1992/15] | AT | 14.08.1991 | |
SE | 14.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/13] | SE | 14.08.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB759120 (JOHN LESTER WHITMORE); | [A]FR2353212 (MICHEL MARCEL [FR]); | [A]FR2426387 (GALLO ROGER [FR]); | [A]EP0100186 (BOMFORD & EVERSHED LTD [GB]) |