EP0286560 - Removable court for the practice of squash or other sports [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. ASSISTANCE ET DEVELOPPEMENT INTERNATIONAL 62, rue du 10 Avril F-31500 Toulouse / FR | For all designated states Puchaux, Robert 71 Avenue des Italiens 31830 La Salvetat Saint Gilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | For all designated states S.A. ASSISTANCE ET DEVELOPPEMENT INTERNATIONAL 62, rue du 10 Avril F-31500 Toulouse / FR | ||
For all designated states Puchaux, Robert 71 Avenue des Italiens F-31830 La Salvetat Saint Gilles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puchaux Robert 71 AV. des Italiens F-31830 La Salvetat St Gilles / FR | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Ravina, Bernard Ravina S.A. 8, rue des Briquetiers Z.A. de Font Grasse 31700 Blagnac / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | Ravina, Bernard Cabinet Bernard RAVINA 24, boulevard Riquet F-31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 88450011.7 | 30.03.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | FR19870004592 | 31.03.1987 Original published format: FR 8704592 | [1988/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0286560 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04H3/14, E04B2/58 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
E04B2/58 (EP);
E04H3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Zerlegbares Spielfeld für Squash oder andere Sportarten | [1988/41] | English: | Removable court for the practice of squash or other sports | [1988/41] | French: | Terrain de jeu demontable pour la pratique du squash ou autres | [1988/41] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/13] | 25.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB682554 [ ]; | FR2457700 [ ]; | GB466220 [ ]; | PE125179 [ ]; | EP0125179 [ ]; | GB906024 [ ] |