EP0328843 - Variable rate shock absorber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.1993 [1993/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENDIX ESPANA, S.A. Calle Balmes, 243 E-08006 Barcelona / ES | [1989/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simon Bacardit, Juan C. Mallorca, 451 E-08013 Barcelona / ES | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Lejet, Christian BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Lejet, Christian BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 88500011.7 | 15.02.1988 | [1989/34] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0328843 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0328843 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/46, B60G17/08 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
B60G17/0152 (EP,US);
F16F9/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/34] | Title | German: | Dämpfer mit veränderbarer Dämpfkraft | [1989/34] | English: | Variable rate shock absorber | [1989/34] | French: | Amortisseur à caractéristique variable | [1989/34] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 06.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0122575 (F & O ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS [DE]); | [A]GB664770 (WOODHEAD MONROE LTD, et al); | [A]DE3231739 (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0066154 (BOGE GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2159604 (BOGE GMBH); | [A]EP0186167 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPS57115468U ; | [AD]US3039566 (DOUGLAS RUMSEY ROLLIN) |