EP0323384 - Centrifugal pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOMBAS ELECTRICAS, S.A. (BOELSA) Ctra. de Mieras, s.n. E-17820 Banyoles (Gerona) / ES | [1989/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pages, Pages, Jose Ctra. de Mieras, s.n. E-17820 Banyoles (Gerona) / ES | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Ferregüela Colon, Eduardo Oficina Sugranes Calle Provenza, 304 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | Ferregüela Colon, Eduardo Oficina Sugranes Calle Provenza, 304 E-08008 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1989/27] | Morgades Manonelles, Juan Antonio Calle Valencia, 300 - entresuelo 1a E-08009 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 88500127.1 | 27.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | ES19880000215 | 28.12.1987 Original published format: ES 8800215 | [1989/27] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323384 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323384 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323384 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F04D9/06 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
F04D9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Kreiselpumpe | [1989/27] | English: | Centrifugal pump | [1989/27] | French: | Pompe centrifuge | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 16.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.1993 | DE | 21.04.1993 | GB | 21.04.1993 | GR | 21.04.1993 | NL | 21.04.1993 | SE | 21.04.1993 | BE | 31.12.1993 | CH | 31.12.1993 | LI | 31.12.1993 | LU | 31.12.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1995/11] | AT | 21.04.1993 | |
DE | 21.04.1993 | ||
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
BE | 31.12.1993 | ||
CH | 31.12.1993 | ||
LI | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | AT | 21.04.1993 | |
DE | 21.04.1993 | ||
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
CH | 31.12.1993 | ||
LI | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 21.04.1993 | |
DE | 21.04.1993 | ||
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/03] | DE | 21.04.1993 | |
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | GB | 21.04.1993 | |
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | NL | 21.04.1993 | |
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | NL | 21.04.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2525772 (CONERY WILLIAM J); | [A]US2934021 (CONERY WILLIAM J, et al); | [A]US2941474 (HALL MALCOLM S); | [A]GB1201721 (MUANYAGIPARI KI [HU]); | [A]DE3409463 (GRUNDFOS AS [DK]); | [AP]DE3718273 (PUMPEN & VERDICHTER VEB K [DD]) |