EP0315564 - Electronic unit injector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STANADYNE AUTOMOTIVE CORP. 92 Deerfield Road Windsor Connecticut 06095 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states STANADYNE AUTOMOTIVE CORP. 92 Deerfield Road Windsor Connecticut 06095 / US | ||
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states STANADYNE INC. 100 Deerfield Road Windsor Connecticut 06095 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Djordjevic, Ilija 47 Stonehenge Drive Windsor Connecticut / US | 02 /
Kelly, William W. 10 Brianwood Lane Granby Connecticut / US | 03 /
Vanderpoel, Richard E. One Musket Trail Bloomfield Connecticut / US | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 88630184.5 | 28.10.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | US19870115845 | 02.11.1987 Original published format: US 115845 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315564 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0315564 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F02M45/06, F02M57/02 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
F02M59/22 (EP,US);
F02M45/06 (EP,US);
F02M57/02 (EP,US);
F02M57/023 (EP,US);
F02M59/366 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Elektronische Pumpen-Düsen-Einheit | [1989/19] | English: | Electronic unit injector | [1989/19] | French: | Pompe-injecteur combinée à commande électronique | [1989/19] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 25.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59203864 ; | [Y]FR1495537 (PEUGEOT); | [Y]FR2067883 (PEUGEOT); | [A]GB748243 (CAV LTD); | [A]EP0150471 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 73 (M-368)[1796], 3rd April 1985; & JP-A-59 203 864 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) 19-11-1984, & JP59203864 A 00000000 |