EP0323389 - Arrangement for controlling the position of an aircraft control surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Novis, Ari M. 24 Terry Lane Rocky Hill Connecticut 06067 / US | 02 /
LaMontagne, Troy J. 358 South Cherry Street Wallingford Connecticut 06492 / US | 03 /
Adams, Don L. 478 North Benson Road Fairfield Connecticut 06430 / US | 04 /
Sivahop, Albert 27 Powdermill Lane Trumbull Connecticut 06492 / US | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 88630216.5 | 01.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | US19870138618 | 24.12.1987 Original published format: US 138618 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323389 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323389 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323389 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/04 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
G05D1/0061 (EP);
B64C13/00 (KR);
B64C13/50 (US);
G05D1/0055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/27] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Steuerung einer Steuerfläche eines Flugzeuges | [1989/27] | English: | Arrangement for controlling the position of an aircraft control surface | [1989/27] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'une surface de contrôle d'un aéronef | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 22.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3655992 (OHNO ISAMU, et al); | [A]GB1275979 (DECCA LTD [GB]); | [A]DD114703 ; | [A]DE2547368 |