EP0279772 - Silica brick and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. C. Otto Feuerfest GmbH Postfach 51 01 09 44874 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states Dr. C. Otto Feuerfest GmbH Postfach 51 01 09 D-44874 Bochum / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koschlig, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Am Schamberge 10 b D-4630 Bochum 5 / DE | 02 /
Overkott, Engelbert, Dr. Nachtigallenstrasse 30 D-5820 Gevelsberg / DE | [1988/34] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Postfach 13 01 13 42028 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Postfach 13 01 13 42028 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1991/36] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Postfach 13 01 13 D-42028 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1988/34] | Kaiser, Henning SALZGITTER AG Patente und Lizenzen Kurfürstendamm 32 Postfach 15 12 27 D-10668 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 88730034.1 | 12.02.1988 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | DE19873705002 | 17.02.1987 Original published format: DE 3705002 | [1988/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0279772 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279772 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/85, C04B41/50, C04B35/68 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
C04B35/14 (EP,US);
C04B41/5089 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1988/34] | Title | German: | Silikastein sowie Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1988/34] | English: | Silica brick and process for its production | [1988/34] | French: | Brique siliceuse et procédé de sa fabrication | [1988/34] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 20.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3032920 [ ] (OTTO & CO GMBH DR C [DE]); | DD247209 [ ] (VER PORZELLANWERKE KAHLA VEB [DD]) | Examination | DE2223142 |