Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE83695T | 15.01.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | EP88730140 | 24.06.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3876884D1 | 04.02.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | DE3876884 | 24.06.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0300953 | Global Dossier | 23.12.1992 | B1 | EP0300953 | 02.05.1990 | A3 | EP0300953 | 25.01.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8803166 | 08.02.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1315522 | 06.04.1993 | C | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1034559C | 16.04.1997 | C | CN1031340 | 01.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3724628 | 25.08.1988 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2036713T | 01.06.1993 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN172153 | 17.04.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6431557 | 01.02.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR960007627B | 07.06.1996 | B1 | KR890001664 | 28.03.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4928747 | 29.05.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3724628 | 22.07.1987 |