EP0300953 - Continuous casting mould for manufacturing thin strands in slabbing size [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pleschiutschnigg, Fritz-Peter, Dr. Ing. Reiserweg 69 D-4100 Duisburg 29 / DE | 02 /
Möllers, Gerd, Dipl.-Ing. Nordstrasse 14 D-4200 Oberhausen 11 / DE | 03 /
Eberhardt, Hans-Georg Gaussstrasse 7 D-4100 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
Rahmfeld, Werner, Dr. Ing. Stockweg 32 D-4330 Mühlheim/Ruhr / DE | 05 /
Parschat, Lothar, Dipl.-Ing. An der Dellen 2a D-4030 Ratingen 5 / DE | 06 /
Ehrenberg, Hans-Jürgen Im kleinen Winkel 28 D-4000 Düsseldorf 31 / DE | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Presting, Hans-Joachim, et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 330130 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Presting, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 330130 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1989/04] | Presting, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 88730140.6 | 24.06.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | DE19873724628 | 22.07.1987 Original published format: DE 3724628 | [1989/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300953 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300953 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300953 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/04 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
B22D11/0408 (EP,US);
B22D11/04 (KR);
B22D11/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Stranggiesskokille zur Erzeugung dünner Stränge im Brammenformat | [1989/04] | English: | Continuous casting mould for manufacturing thin strands in slabbing size | [1989/04] | French: | Coquille de coulée continue pour la production des billettes minces en format à brames | [1989/04] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 26.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.1993
02.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE SMS Schloemann-Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Pollmeier, Felix HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE POLLMEIER-VALENTIN-GIHSKE Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 55 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.09.1993
02.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE SMS Schloemann-Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Pollmeier, Felix Patentanwälte, HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-VALENTIN-GIHSKE, Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 55 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 18.10.1993 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 26.11.1993 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 15.12.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.04.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.05.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 08.07.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.09.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.09.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1997/49] | Appeal following opposition | 03.11.1994 | Appeal received No. T0857/94 | 14.01.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.09.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 10.09.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.09.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.06.1997 | GB | 24.06.1997 | LU | 24.06.1997 | ES | 25.06.1997 | SE | 25.06.1997 | BE | 30.06.1997 | CH | 30.06.1997 | LI | 30.06.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/37] | AT | 24.06.1997 | |
GB | 24.06.1997 | ||
ES | 25.06.1997 | ||
SE | 25.06.1997 | ||
BE | 30.06.1997 | ||
CH | 30.06.1997 | ||
LI | 30.06.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 24.06.1997 | |
GB | 24.06.1997 | ||
SE | 25.06.1997 | ||
BE | 30.06.1997 | ||
CH | 30.06.1997 | ||
LI | 30.06.1997 | ||
LU | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 24.06.1997 | |
GB | 24.06.1997 | ||
SE | 25.06.1997 | ||
BE | 30.06.1997 | ||
CH | 30.06.1997 | ||
LI | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 24.06.1997 | |
GB | 24.06.1997 | ||
SE | 25.06.1997 | ||
BE | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | AT | 24.06.1997 | |
SE | 25.06.1997 | ||
BE | 30.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 24.06.1997 | |
SE | 25.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1508809 (CONTINUA INTERNAT CONTINUOUS C); | [A]DE1809744 ; | [A]DE3400220 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) | [AD] - STAHL UND EISEN | Examination | - STAHL UND EISEN, Band 106, Nr. 23, 17. November 1986, S. 1255, 1256 |