EP0305320 - Multinucleic substituted complexants, complexes and complex salts, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical agents containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state ???moredetails.lapse.edited??? GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deutsch, Julius, Dr. Horstweg 25 D-1000 Berlin 19 / DE | 02 /
Conrad, Jürgen, Dr. Sonnenallee 70 D-1000 Berlin 44 / DE | [1989/09] | Application number, filing date | 88730187.7 | 23.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | DE19873728525 | 24.08.1987 Original published format: DE 3728525 | [1989/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0305320 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0305320 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305320 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/28, C07D257/02, C07D207/452, C07F5/00, A61K49/00, A61K31/555 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
C07D207/452 (EP);
A61K51/1093 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07C243/00 (EP);
C07D207/46 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1989/09] | C07C101/26, C07D257/02, C07D207/452, C07F5/00, A61K49/00, A61K31/555 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/09] | Title | German: | Mehrkernige substituierte Komplexbildner, Komplexe und Komplexsalze, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Mittel | [1989/09] | English: | Multinucleic substituted complexants, complexes and complex salts, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical agents containing them | [1989/09] | French: | Complexants à multinoyaux substitués, complexes et sels complexes, procédé pour leur préparation et expédients pharmaceutiques qui les contiennent | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 04.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Request for further processing for: | 21.05.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 21.05.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.09.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1993/40] | deleted | ||
Former [1993/28] | DE | 23.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3401052 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [A]WO8602352 (UNIV TEXAS [US]); | [A]EP0186947 (NYEGAARD & CO AS [NO]); | [A]WO8606384 (GANSOW OTTO A [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 76, 1. Mai 1972, Seite 351, Nr. 104531j, Columbus, Ohio, US; I.V. PODGORNAYA et al.: "Complexing properties of a polycomplexon", & TR. INST. KHIM. AKAD. NAUK SSSR, URAL. FILIAL 1971, Nr. 21, 51-5 |