EP0278911 - Bicyclic beta-lactam carboxylic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Marc, Dr. Rue des Ormes 6 F-68170 Rixheim / FR | [1988/33] | Application number, filing date | 88810069.0 | 05.02.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | CH19870000498 | 11.02.1987 Original published format: CH 49887 | CH19870003373 | 03.09.1987 Original published format: CH 337387 | [1988/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0278911 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278911 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D499/00, A61K31/43, // C07F9/568 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
C07D499/88 (EP,US);
C07D499/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1988/33] | C07D499/00, A61K31/43, // C07F9/65 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Bicyclische beta-Lactam-carbonsäuren | [1988/33] | English: | Bicyclic beta-lactam carboxylic acids | [1988/33] | French: | Acides bêta-lactame carboxyliques bicycliques | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2950898 [ ] (BRISTOL MYERS CO); | EP0170028 [ ] (HOECHST UK LTD [GB]); | EP0236880 [ ] (ERBA FARMITALIA [IT]); | EP0070204 [ ] |