EP0288435 - Process for the production of proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyhack, Bernd, Dr. Höhenweg 9 CH-4132 Magden / CH | 02 /
Heim, Jutta, Dr. Rankackerweg 18 CH-4133 Pratteln / CH | 03 /
Bürgi, Rolf, Dr. Bläsiring 140 CH-4057 Basle / CH | [1988/43] | Application number, filing date | 88810234.0 | 11.04.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | GB19870009081 | 15.04.1987 Original published format: GB 8709081 | GB19870014059 | 16.06.1987 Original published format: GB 8714059 | IE19870003299 | 04.12.1987 Original published format: IE 329987 | [1988/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0288435 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0288435 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/58, C12N9/72, C12P21/00, C07K15/14, C12N1/16, A61K37/02, // (C12N15/00, C12R1:865) | [1994/11] | CPC: |
C12N9/2408 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C12N15/81 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C12N9/6462 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21073 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1988/43] | C12N15/00, C12N9/72, C12P21/00, C07K15/14, C12N1/16, A61K37/02, // (C12N15/00, C12R1:865) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Proteinen | [1988/43] | English: | Process for the production of proteins | [1988/43] | French: | Procédé de production de protéines | [1988/43] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 13.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 11.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0037687 [ ] (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | EP0092182 [ ] (GENENTECH INC [US]); | EP0154272 [ ] (GREEN CROSS CORP [JP]); | EP0200451 [ ] (GENENTECH INC [US]); | EP0210279 [ ] (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP], et al) | Examination | - D4: EP-A-143 081 | - D5: EP-A-178 105 |