EP0289459 - Process for the electrolytic grey coloring of anodic oxide layers on aluminium or aluminium alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.1989 [1989/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schweizerische Aluminium AG CH-3965 Chippis / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/44] | For all designated states SCHWEIZERISCHE ALUMINIUM AG CH-3965 Chippis / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneeberger, Fritz Plattenhalde 15 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 02 /
Steup, Heinz Meisenweg 7 D-7710 Donaueschingen / DE | 03 /
Paulet, Jean-François Grabenstrasse 39 CH-8225 Siblingen / CH | 04 /
Boetsch, Bruno Charlottenweg 21 CH-8212 Neuhausen / CH | [1988/44] | Application number, filing date | 88810254.8 | 21.04.1988 | [1988/44] | Priority number, date | CH19870001651 | 30.04.1987 Original published format: CH 165187 | [1988/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289459 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/22 | [1988/44] | CPC: |
C25D11/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur elektrolytischen Graufärbung von anodischen Oxidschichten auf Aluminium oder Aluminiumlegierungen | [1988/44] | English: | Process for the electrolytic grey coloring of anodic oxide layers on aluminium or aluminium alloys | [1988/44] | French: | Procédé de coloration électrolytique en gris des couches d'oxydes anodiques sur de l'aluminium ou sur des alliages d'aluminium | [1988/44] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/51] | 27.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3522117 ; | [Y]FR2111674 ; | [A]DE2128194 ; | [A]GB2053972 | [Y] - GALVANOTECHNIK, Band 77, Nr. 9, 1986, Seiten 2123-2127, SaulgauDE; T.L. SHARMA et al.: "Ein schnelles Verfahren zum elektrolytischen F{rben von Aluminium und seinen Legierungen" |