EP0302827 - Process for the formation of images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irving, Edward 41, Swaffham Road Burwell Cambridge CB5 0AN / GB | 02 /
Walshe, Josphine Mary Angela 15, Cherry Bounds Road Girton Cambridge CB3 0JT / GB | 03 /
Mallaband, Anne, Dr. 10 Grosvenor House Stortford Hall Park Bishops Stortford Hertfordshire CM23 5AG / GB | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Sharman, Thomas, et al CIBA-GEIGY PLC. Patent Department, Central Research, Hulley Road Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 2NX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | Sharman, Thomas, et al CIBA-GEIGY PLC. Patent Department, Central Research, Hulley Road Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 2NX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88810518.6 | 27.07.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | GB19870018497 | 05.08.1987 Original published format: GB 8718497 | GB19880012385 | 25.05.1988 Original published format: GB 8812385 | [1989/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0302827 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0302827 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302827 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/16 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
G03F7/164 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsverfahren | [1989/06] | English: | Process for the formation of images | [1989/06] | French: | Procédé pour obtenir des images | [1989/06] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0176356 ; | [A]EP0177453 ; | [A]EP0204415 |